Financial history WHIDDON VALLEY EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1141903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £33.89k £40.24k £67.00k £46.22k £70.26k
Total expenditure £37.36k £34.86k £56.00k £42.55k £51.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A