Habitats & Heritage

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Habitats & Heritage's activities include bringing people together to learn about the environment and heritage, delivering projects which protect and enhance the local environment and heritage and encourage sustainable behaviour, and providing a capacity building service and representation for the local third sector in relation to environmental and sustainability issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£516,017
Donations and legacies | £21.88k | |
Charitable activities | £466.27k | |
Other trading activities | £26.56k | |
Investments | £1.30k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£438,752
Raising funds | £5.80k | |
Charitable activities | £432.96k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £8,535 from 1 government contract(s) and £384,277 from 19 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.80k | |
Charitable expenditure | £432.96k | |
Retained for future use | £77.27k |
People

13 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ealing
- Hounslow
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Merton
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 24 March 2011: Standard registration
- 06 April 2022: Funds received from 294869 ENVIRONMENT TRUST
- SOUTH WEST LONDON ENVIRONMENT NETWORK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Sabir Mughal | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Brooks | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olga Pomazan | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lee | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Andrew Houchin | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Lorraine Lawrence | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Elizabeth Rose Creighton | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Christopher Tyson | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Hagell | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.31k | £208.27k | £399.03k | £389.70k | £516.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.88k | £153.47k | £332.96k | £405.24k | £438.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £48.41k | £87.15k | £127.11k | £108.99k | £8.54k | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.60k | £30.40k | £134.28k | £224.49k | £384.28k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.88k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.56k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £466.27k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.30k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £432.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.13k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £232.44k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 14/12/2010 as amended on 30 Jan 2014 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 25 Nov 2020 as amended on 25 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
4(1) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN SOUTH WEST LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY: (A) BUILDING THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE WORKING ON PROJECTS WHICH AIM TO ACHIEVE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING THEM WITH SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES; (B) PROMOTING THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES, AND SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; AND (C) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES, AND PROMOTING AND CONDUCTING STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS, PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. 4(2) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 4(3) FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ARTICLE 4: (A) "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS; (B) "THIRD SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES; (C) "CHARITIES" ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; AND (D) "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES" ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ETNA COMMUNITY CENTRE
13 ROSSLYN ROAD
TWICKENHAM
TW1 2AR
- Phone:
- 07860878462
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window