ST AUSTELL METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1141712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting the Methodist Churches in the St Austell Circuit of the Cornwall Methodist District

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £224,798
Total expenditure: £246,549

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 2011: Standard registration
  • 26 October 2019: Funds received from 1136059 THE SACRED TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

79 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paul Martyn Benney Chair 01 September 2021
None on record
Nigel John Young Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
JANET SUSAN MASSIAH Trustee 24 November 2024
None on record
ROSEMARY WEBB Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
SHEILA ELIZABETH ALLEN Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Rosemary Heard Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Rev Stephen Michael Hatch Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
JULIA ANNE HUBBARD Trustee 13 June 2024
St John's with Trinity Trewoon Methodist Church
Received: On time
IVAN JOHN PHILLIPS Trustee 13 June 2024
FRIENDS OF RESCORLA
Received: On time
ALAN KEITH TRUSCOTT Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Rev PAULINE ANN WEST Trustee 13 March 2024
None on record
Valerie Dawn Cavey Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Charlotte Jane Field Trustee 07 December 2023
None on record
Chris Sturley Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Julie Elizabeth Passmore Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Elwyn Moreton Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Laura Jean Mitchell Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
Jo-Anne Petzing Trustee 16 March 2023
None on record
DEBORAH KATHRYN EADE Trustee 24 November 2022
St John's with Trinity Trewoon Methodist Church
Received: On time
Jane Harris Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
Kim Noel Briggs Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
Rev Iris Ruth Bray Trustee 01 September 2022
Cornwall and the Isles of Scilly Methodist District
Received: On time
South West Peninsula Methodist District
Received: On time
Sheila Nancy Joan Gill Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
Brian William Palmer Trustee 10 March 2022
None on record
Karen Ann Hopkins Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
Madge Mitchell Trustee 02 December 2021
None on record
FRANCES MARGARET WALKER Trustee 02 December 2021
St John's with Trinity Trewoon Methodist Church
Received: On time
Frederick Maurice Jenkin Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Judy Uden Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Susan Williams Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
Marion Joyce Curtis Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
Karen Reynolds Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
Gill Oxenham Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
Mary Lightfoot Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
Patrick Stephen Reynolds Trustee 19 March 2020
South West Peninsula Methodist District
Received: On time
Annabelle Vera Coad Trustee 10 December 2018
None on record
Celia Jane Mitchell Trustee 03 December 2017
None on record
Peter Clive William Santo Warner Trustee 25 November 2017
None on record
Helen Lorraine Trudgeon Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
JENNIFER SHIRLEY TAYLOR Trustee 28 March 2017
Cornwall and the Isles of Scilly Methodist District
Received: On time
FOURWAYS
Received: On time
ELIZABETH ANNE FOSTER Trustee 25 March 2017
None on record
Dianne Mary Whitford Trustee 25 March 2017
None on record
Peggy May Gill Trustee 25 March 2017
None on record
Patricia Jean Thomas Trustee 20 February 2017
None on record
GARETH BRAY MBE Trustee 29 July 2016
COSGARNE HALL LTD.
Received: On time
HELEN SARAH BLAMEY Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
JEANNETTE WARREN Trustee 09 March 2016
None on record
Angela Mary Richards Trustee 17 March 2015
None on record
Nicola Goudie Trustee 21 October 2014
None on record
LIZ BURROUGHS Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Rosemary Elizabeth Owens Trustee 04 July 2014
None on record
Susan Christine Laming-Le Tissier Trustee 10 June 2014
FRIENDS OF RESCORLA
Received: On time
JOHN FORTESCUE HUBBARD Trustee 14 March 2014
St John's with Trinity Trewoon Methodist Church
Received: On time
EVA LYN HAWKEN Trustee 26 May 2013
None on record
DOROTHY PEARCE Trustee 10 September 2011
None on record
HENRY WILLIAMS HAWKEN Trustee 04 September 2011
None on record
ELIZABETH BARBARA ANNE ROGERS Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record
GEOFFREY COAD Trustee 18 August 2011
None on record
JONATHAN KENT Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
MARGARET ANN BAMPTON Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
TONY WARREN Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
MARJORIE JOAN KEAM Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
ALBERT JAMES SANDERS Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
MARGARET JOY MINEAR Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
ELIZABETH HEATHER JOHNS Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
DIANE ROBINS Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
FRANCES JEAN COLE Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
MARIA TRUSCOTT-ROBINS Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
CAROLE THORNTON Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
COLIN FRANKLYN JOHN GRIGG JP Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
WILLIAM MAX RICHARDS Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
ELIZABETH ANN HAWKEN Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
ETHEL EDNA YELLAND Trustee 30 March 2011
None on record
SUSAN BATTISON Trustee 30 March 2011
ROCHE VICTORY HALL TRUST
Received: On time
William John Keast OBE Trustee 30 March 2011
ST AUSTELL CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
St John's with Trinity Trewoon Methodist Church
Received: On time
ST AUSTELL FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND SPEECH
Received: On time
CHRISTINE IVY HICKS Trustee 30 March 2011
THE BUGLE WVS DARBY AND JOAN CLUB
Received: On time
BARBARA ANNE KEAST Trustee 30 March 2011
ST AUSTELL CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
ST AUSTELL FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND SPEECH
Received: On time
St John's with Trinity Trewoon Methodist Church
Received: On time
JEAN NORTHCOTT Trustee 30 March 2011
St John's with Trinity Trewoon Methodist Church
Received: On time
WILLIAM DENNIS MITCHELL Trustee 30 March 2011
NANPEAN PLAYING FIELDS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £262.11k £212.09k £433.72k £208.70k £224.80k
Total expenditure £291.79k £289.15k £277.81k £266.96k £246.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 13 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Eastbourne Road
ST. AUSTELL
Cornwall
PL25 4SZ
Phone:
07805 361090