WOODFORD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Trustees are committed to enabling as many people as possible to worship at the Church, participate in church activities and for the Church to be well involved in our local community in South Woodford, London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Redbridge
Governance
- 02 April 2011: Standard registration
- WBC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Abraham Cherian | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Bethan Mary Davies Kay | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rozier Van Blerk | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Waterfield | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Christiaan Kriel | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Marianne Escobar | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Michelle McNeil | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Gordon Woolley | Trustee | 04 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LAURA CLARK | Trustee | 02 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.30k | £270.92k | £169.19k | £174.80k | £167.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.26k | £121.54k | £131.40k | £149.51k | £159.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ADOPTED 28/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODFORD BAPTIST CHURCH
32 GEORGE LANE
LONDON
E18 1LW
- Phone:
- 020 8530 4916
- Email:
- admin@woodfordbaptist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window