SUSSEX CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIMITED

Charity number: 1142272
Charity is in administration

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are an umbrella organisation for youth organisations in East and West Sussex and Brighton & Hove. Established for over 80 years, we are committed to developing a vibrant grassroots led voluntary and community youth sector, which involves, empowers and meets the needs of young people in Sussex. We currently support 148 member organisations and directly deliver 43 weekly youth activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public. Works with a professional fundraiser with an agreement in place. It does not work with a commercial participator.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove
  • East Sussex
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 June 2011: Standard registration
  • 27 February 2013: Funds received from 305453 SUSSEX CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SCYP (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Rachel Cooper FCA Trustee 07 December 2022
HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLE OF WIGHT COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Andre Benham Trustee 19 May 2018
None on record
SUSAN ROBERTSON Trustee 15 April 2011
None on record
JACQUELINE COOPER Trustee 15 April 2011
BURGESS HILL YOUTH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £79.72k £214.00k £322.14k £482.81k £730.53k
Total expenditure £104.37k £202.77k £359.10k £456.21k £631.03k
Income from government contracts N/A £10.50k £73.46k £73.65k £179.80k
Income from government grants £2.64k £14.00k £44.49k £27.17k £113.95k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £396.42k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £334.11k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £2
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £513.91k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.30k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £67.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £104.81k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £113.14k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £226.85k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £91.74k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024
Annual return 31 March 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KRESTON REEVES
MONTAGUE PLACE
QUAYSIDE
CHATHAM MARITIME
CHATHAM
ME4 4QU
Phone:
01634899813
Website:

HTTPS://WWW.KRESTONREEVES.COM