SOUTHPORT @NORTHWEST MACULAR SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help desk every Thursday 10am to 12am & 1pm to 3pm at the one stop shop Southport Group meetings twice a month 2 & 4 Tuesday in the mouth at Lord street west Southport also a help desk at Bootle one stop shop .we take our members on day out.we give them advice and support information and support .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wigan
- Wirral
Governance
- 01 June 2011: Standard registration
- 10 May 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 10 May 2016: Funds transferred to 526088 GALLOWAY'S SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.40k | £7.86k | £8.48k | £8.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.08k | £7.42k | £7.86k | £8.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 14 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 31 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 27 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 31/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE SUFFERING SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY BY SUCH MEANS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THEIR GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES SUITED TO THEIR NEEDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window