PENISTONE LADIES' CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Penistone Ladies' Choir aims to develop an awareness and appreciation of music, particularly choral music, by means of public concerts and recitals. The Choir helps to foster community spirit and fellowship in music through joint performance with other individuals and musical groups and to encourage younger musicians to perform as part of our concerts in order to give them valuable experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 14 October 2011: Standard registration
- 10 September 2019: Funds received from 511148 PENISTONE COMPETITIVE MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Patricia Seymour | Chair | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Debra Claire Smith | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Zillah Abigail Amma Scott | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Anderson | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Johnson | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Peace | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Teather | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.88k | £8.28k | £5.60k | £9.89k | £11.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.12k | £6.18k | £6.57k | £9.66k | £10.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC DEUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SEE FIT, INCLUDING PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fieldhead
Baggerwood Road
Thurgoland
SHEFFIELD
S35 7AX
- Phone:
- 07759174435
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window