ST ANTONY'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The College's main activity is the provision of excellent post-graduate education and research opportunities to world-class students and academics from across the globe, focusing on international relations, economics, politics, history, anthropology and interdisciplinary area studies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£11,772,000
Donations and legacies | £4.59m | |
Charitable activities | £4.47m | |
Other trading activities | £405.00k | |
Investments | £2.30m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,642,000
Raising funds | £676.00k | |
Charitable activities | £7.97m | |
Other | £0 |
-£2,419,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £676.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.97m | |
Retained for future use | £3.13m |
People

111 Employee(s)
42 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 April 2011: Standard registration
- ST ANTONY'S COLLEGE OXFORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
42 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR ROGER GOODMAN | Chair | 23 August 2011 |
|
|||||
Prof Kristi Govella | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janaki Srinivasan | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Odijie | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gregory Thaler | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Federica Genovese | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Lusthaus | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Rochlitz | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amir Lebdioui | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raihan Ismail | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Briddick | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zbigniew Wojnowski | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maryam Alemzadeh | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Ketchley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Irem Guceri | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Baldwin | Trustee | 13 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Simukai Chigudu | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothee Vlandas | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eric Justin Chaney | Trustee | 14 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Blessing Tendi | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katie Helen Sullivan De Estrada | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Hale | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Whittaker | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Power | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DOMINIC JOHNSON | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAMON SARRO | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Betts | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROY ALLISON | Trustee | 26 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr LAURENT MIGNON | Trustee | 26 March 2012 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR LEIGH ANN PAYNE | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr WALTER TICE ARMBRUST | Trustee | 11 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID JOHNSON | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID PRATTEN | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Prof MICHAEL WILLIS | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHO KONISHI | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR TAKEHIKO KARIYA | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL CHAISTY | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor Faisal Devji | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Prof Eugene Rogan | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Dr DIEGO SANCHEZ-ANCOCHEA | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr NANDINI GOOPTU | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr RACHEL MURPHY | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.62m | £8.06m | £10.05m | £9.05m | £11.77m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.84m | £7.50m | £6.92m | £8.24m | £8.64m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.17m | £2.30m | £4.50m | £2.39m | £4.59m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £562.00k | £131.00k | £3.00k | £132.00k | £405.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.03m | £3.77m | £3.85m | £4.20m | £4.47m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £626.00k | £547.00k | £602.00k | £293.00k | £172.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £870.00k | £1.62m | £1.52m | £1.94m | £2.30m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £231.00k | £179.00k | £387.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £1.86m | £230.02k | £3.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.03m | £7.15m | £6.67m | £7.67m | £7.97m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £816.00k | £348.00k | £256.00k | £565.00k | £676.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £19.00k | £20.00k | £24.00k | £27.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £12.00k | £1.00k | £11.00k | £195.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £25.15m | £73.67m | £59.56m | £30.69m | £90.00m | |
|
Long-term investments | £49.74m | £3.97m | £31.46m | £61.41m | £110.00k | |
|
Other assets | £5.07m | £7.38m | £6.83m | £4.94m | £2.42m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.25m | -£754.00k | -£719.00k | -£1.12m | -£746.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.58m | £11.87m | £11.95m | £8.20m | £3.34m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 09/02/2011 AND STATUTES REVISED OF 9 FEBRUARY 2011
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE MEN AND WOMEN WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD WITH A COLLEGE WHEREIN THEY MAY WORK FOR HIGHER DEGREES IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD OR ENGAGE IN ACADEMIC RESEARCH ESPECIALLY IN THE DISCIPLINES OF THE SOCIAL SCIENCES AND THE HUMANITIES AND A RANGE OF OTHER SUBJECT AREAS AS APPROVED BY THE GOVERNING BODY. (B) TO DO ALL OTHER SUCH THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO ADVANCING EDUCATION AND ACADEMIC RESEARCH IN OXFORD OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
OXFORD OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Antony's College
62 Woodstock Road
OXFORD
OX2 6JF
- Phone:
- 01865284742
- Email:
- bursar@sant.ox.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window