Financial history WEST CUMBRIA RIVERS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1142396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.41m £2.63m £1.46m £1.72m £1.42m
Total expenditure £1.35m £2.41m £1.41m £1.52m £1.28m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.08m £2.16m £625.64k £740.13k £625.07k
Income - Donations and legacies £26.13k £115.15k £13.25k £20.25k £15.28k
Income - Other trading activities £25.11k £22.89k £40.55k £17.01k £58.85k
Income - Charitable activities £1.36m £2.49m £1.40m £1.68m £1.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.67k £537 £0 £0 £9.93k
Income - Other £0 £0 £5.60k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.34m £2.41m £1.41m £1.52m £1.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £921 £40 £0 £0 £150
Expenditure - Governance £3.64k £3.84k £3.94k £4.38k £4.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0