Financial history PONSANOOTH HALL MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Charity number: 1142542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £10.25k £5.60k £15.24k £19.72k £20.62k
Total expenditure £15.57k £11.75k £16.52k £21.50k £22.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A