THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP, CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular open public worship. Providing space, including a cafe, for community use compatible with the Christian faith. Promoting the whole mission of the Church including teaching, pastoral work and activities with a Christian ethos for older people, young people and other groups. Christian events such as, meetings, literature and work in schools. Supporting Christian work in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,850 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 20 June 2011: Standard registration
- ST PHILIP'S CHURCH, CAMBRIDGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ruth Mary Barry | Chair | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Francis Deakin | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Hurst | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tatiana Gadelha Serra dos Santos | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Andrews | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Polly Belinda Macartney | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Nigel Syrop | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARTIN CLARK | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE CATHERINE BATTEN | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BROWN | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bea Ridley | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN PRIESTLEY | Trustee | 08 June 2011 |
|
|||||
JIM GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.91k | £191.15k | £210.84k | £181.03k | £176.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.78k | £192.22k | £197.12k | £161.63k | £167.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.20k | £2.44k | £14.72k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.56k | £16.17k | £500 | £1.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2023 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2023 | 269 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2023 | 634 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2023 | 634 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Excepted
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Philips Church
185 Mill Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3AN
- Phone:
- 01223414775
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window