Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MUCH WENLOCK WITH BOURTON

Charity number: 1142708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £95.64k £182.65k £132.65k £132.49k £177.11k
Total expenditure £118.27k £110.20k £133.10k £126.07k £201.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.35k £500 N/A N/A N/A