THE OHMI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Enabling inclusion in music-making for people with physical disabilities through the creation and provision of instruments capable of performance at the highest level. Instruments and enabling apparatus are acquired principally through the annual OHMI Competition. - Encouraging the teaching of these instruments - Raising awareness of current exclusion of disabled people from music performance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 September 2011: Standard registration
- THE ONE HANDED MUSICAL INSTRUMENT PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Paddi Salters | Chair | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Liane Todd | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Eleanor Logan | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mathew Dalgleish | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon King | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matthew Wright | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Brown | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Palmer McPherson | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MARTIN FAUTLEY | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.37k | £147.96k | £112.21k | £221.16k | £150.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.64k | £104.71k | £110.45k | £143.94k | £144.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 APR 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND ENABLE THE CREATION OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS THAT CAN BE PLAYED: (A) WITHOUT THE USE OF ONE HAND AND ARM AND (B) THAT ARE CAPABLE OF FULLY AND ACCURATELY EMULATING A TRADITIONAL ORCHESTRAL INSTRUMENT TO ENABLE DISABLED INDIVIDUALS TO HAVE UNDIFFERENTIATED PARTICIPATION IN MUSIC MAKING AND SUCH SIMILAR AND ASSOCIATED MUSICAL PROJECTS FOR THE RELIEF OF DISABILITY. TO ADVANCE AND ENABLE THESE OBJECTS BY: - PROVIDING AND ASSITING IN THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE FACILITIES AND FUNDING; - THE CREATION OF PARTNERSHIPS WITH EXISTING INSTITUTIONS AND ORGANISATIONS, BOTH IN GREAT BRITAIN AND INTERNATIONALLY; - BRINGING TOGETHER DIFFERENT KINDS OF CREATIVE PEOPLE; - CREATING A COMPETITIVE ENVIRONMENT TO PROMOTE THE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH SOPHISTICTATED MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS; AND - BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY BE DETERMINED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE TRUSTEES SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tyndallwoods Solicitors Ltd
29 Woodbourne Road
Harborne
BIRMINGHAM
B17 8BY
- Phone:
- 07491331599
- Email:
- admin@ohmi.org.uk
- Website:
-
ohmi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window