Financial history GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE

Charity Number: 1142297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £6.21m £6.62m £6.35m £7.56m £9.23m
Total expenditure £6.79m £7.38m £8.96m £7.62m £7.74m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £763.00k £1.40m £572.00k £583.00k £1.97m
Income - Other trading activities £285.00k £98.00k £110.00k £199.00k £213.00k
Income - Charitable activities £3.20m £3.31m £3.99m £4.43m £4.71m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.71m £1.67m £1.68m £2.21m £2.29m
Income - Other £252.00k £139.00k £3.00k £136.00k £51.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £21.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.59m £7.19m £8.74m £7.09m £7.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £203.00k £150.00k £181.00k £413.00k £396.00k
Expenditure - Governance £25.00k £2.47m £0 £47.00k £27.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.00k £1.00k £0 £87.00k £48.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £40.00k £32.00k £113.00k £115.00k