Financial history THE MIDLAND RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1149613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £36.76k £34.24k £20.90k £20.49k £25.02k
Total expenditure £23.02k £24.98k £22.46k £23.79k £39.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A