SIDRAMA LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF THEATRE AND CINEMA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 12 September 2012: Standard registration
- AVENUE THEATRE /SCREEN@THE AVENUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Thornton | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TALBOT SPANN | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Spann | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES FRYER | Trustee | 27 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Janice West | Trustee | 26 May 2011 |
|
|||||
JEAN SPANN | Trustee | 26 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.36k | £40.93k | £49.97k | £79.90k | £70.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.40k | £35.38k | £35.38k | £75.17k | £63.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.48k | £24.37k | £20.56k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/07/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF THEATRE AND CINEMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avenue Theatre
Central House
Avenue of Remembrance
SITTINGBOURNE
ME10 4DN
- Phone:
- 01795471140
- Email:
- admin@avenuetheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window