SHU TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Further the exclusively charitable aims of Sheffield Hallam University advancing education by the provision of higher and further education and undertaking and publishing research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 18 July 2011: Standard registration
- SHEFFIELD HALLAM UNIVERSITY TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor David George Shepherd | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Elizabeth Kate Garland Wilkinson | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Elizabeth Helen Mossop | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Keyworth | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SHEFFIELD HALLAM UNIVERSITY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY DECIDE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ADVANCING EDUCATION THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF PERSONS’ INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING BY THE PROVISION OF HIGHER EDUCATION AND FURTHER EDUCATION AND BY UNDERTAKING AND PUBLISHING RESEARCH FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHEFFIELD HALLAM UNIVERSITY
CITY CAMPUS
HOWARD STREET
SHEFFIELD
S1 1WB
- Phone:
- 01142252051
- Email:
- shucompanies@shu.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window