THE UNQUOTED COMPANIES' GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Membership organisation for family businesses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 October 2011: Standard registration
- 16 July 2013: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 16 July 2013: Funds transferred to 1134085 FAMILY BUSINESS RESEARCH FOUNDATION
- THE UCG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 12 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/10/2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FIELD OF PUBLIC ECONOMY BY WAY OF RESEARCH OR OTHER MEANS, WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO PROMOTING A FULL UNDERSTANDING OF THE ECONOMIC, SOCIAL REGIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL IMPACT OF LONG-TERM FAMILY OWNED UNQUOTED COMPANIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window