Financial history ACORN EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1145108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.98m £8.17m £9.58m £11.42m £13.17m
Total expenditure £6.93m £8.01m £9.57m £11.48m £13.03m
Income from government contracts £417.44k £417.44k £104.36k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £33.39k £64.89k £93.37k N/A £1.16k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.27k £5.49k £4.30k £4.32k £4.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £9.39k £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.97m £8.16m £9.57m £11.40m £13.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £157 £4 £17 £1.44k £6.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.93m £8.01m £9.57m £11.48m £13.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.76k £6.25k £14.23k £26.16k £23.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0