Financial history PROGRESSABILITY.ORG

Charity Number: 1142732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £388.62k £278.02k £324.47k £372.25k £432.99k
Total expenditure £313.35k £311.64k £331.69k £394.00k £432.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A