Financial history CHAPEL STREET NURSERY

Charity Number: 1143145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £75.57k £84.11k £55.63k £43.12k £94.37k
Total expenditure £73.99k £74.56k £71.63k £80.83k £88.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £26.50k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A