Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BARKHAM

Charity number: 1143332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £169.39k £209.65k £178.91k £187.92k £207.83k
Total expenditure £197.66k £192.51k £182.79k £193.25k £193.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £2.30k £2.41k £2.55k £2.70k