THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES ARNSIDE AND STORTH VILLAGE CHURCH

Charity number: 1143293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, small groups & school assemblies Pastoral work, visiting the sick & bereaved Promoting Christianity mission through the staging of events, meetings, the distribution of literature for all Supporting other charities in the UK & overseas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £57,542
Total expenditure: £55,542

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 August 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST JAMES PCC, ARNSIDE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN DOREEN SWIRE Trustee 10 July 2024
None on record
Diana Lesley Jackson Trustee 08 November 2023
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
Rev Hannah Caroline Wallace Trustee 25 June 2022
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
Delyth Rose Langdon Trustee 06 May 2021
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
Edgar Colin Shepherd Trustee 18 October 2020
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
Sandra anne humphery Trustee 08 August 2019
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
Elizabeth spence hay Trustee 07 April 2019
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
Stephanie Marguerite woodburn Trustee 07 April 2019
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
stephanie jane grace griffith Trustee 17 April 2016
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
Ian Service Trustee 24 June 2015
None on record
ANNE JACKSON Trustee 19 April 2015
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
BARBARA HOLDSWORTH Trustee 21 June 2013
KENDAL METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
ROGER MASHITER Trustee 01 May 2012
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
JOHN EDWARDS Trustee 12 August 2011
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time
THE NORTHERN MILL ENGINE SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
ALAN JOHN MITCHELL Trustee 11 July 2011
CHARITY OF ANNIE PICKERING
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £65.83k £56.66k £65.54k £50.12k £57.54k
Total expenditure £66.66k £59.76k £59.82k £58.80k £55.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St James Church
Church Hill
Arnside
Carnforth
LANCS
LA5 0DJ
Phone:
015395 62355
Website:

No information available