Financial history UNIVERSITY OF HERTFORDSHIRE STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1143101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.58m £1.46m £2.56m £2.59m £2.75m
Total expenditure £2.45m £1.39m £2.55m £2.60m £2.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.79k £50.37k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.81m £1.36m £1.72m £1.85m £1.98m
Income - Other trading activities £627.14k £36.36k £775.45k £649.33k £552.48k
Income - Charitable activities £79.01k £18.68k £61.74k £81.79k £203.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.31k £15 £367 £11.89k £12.64k
Income - Other £64.93k £50.37k £0 £0 £6.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.11m £1.66m £1.61m £1.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £820.36k £279.27k £893.51k £994.29k £868.48k
Expenditure - Governance £366.45k £344.66k £397.07k £15.55k £14.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0