THE ALEXANDER AND CAROLINE SIMMONS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of almshouses accommodation and financial grant aid to Churches in the Diocese of Southwell and Nottingham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 08 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Margaret Edginton | Chair | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ian Greaves | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bishop Peter Hill | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Anthony Richard Brown | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|||||
PETER WILLIAM KENT | Trustee | 08 August 2011 |
|
|||||
BISHOP RONALD JAMES MILNER M.A. | Trustee | 08 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.81k | £72.01k | £70.30k | £80.21k | £94.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.35k | £58.89k | £60.02k | £137.83k | £96.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 05/07/2011 as amended on 01 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES,IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRIOITIES IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THE SCHEME; (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; AND (C) THE REPAIR AND RESTORATION OF CHURCHES OR PARSONAGE HOUSES IN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWELL AND NOTTINGHAM AND THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE AND FURNISHINGS FOR SUCH CHURCHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbey Cottage
Alverton
NOTTINGHAM
NG13 9PB
- Phone:
- 01949859543
- Email:
- sawdonclaire@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window