Financial history NOTTINGHAM INTERNATIONAL STUDENTS TRUST

Charity Number: 1143721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/07/2020 16/07/2021 16/07/2022 16/07/2023 16/07/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A