BLACKPOOL ICE DROME CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activites of the Blackpool Ice Drome Charities Association is to organise annual fund raising events, our main event being the production of our annual Childrens Christmas Ice Show. All monies raised go to supporting local children's charities and associations,other worthwhile causes and to promote and develop ice skating in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackpool
Governance
- 22 September 2011: Standard registration
- B.I.D.C.A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KERRY ASHTON | Chair | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Louise Marie Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Louise Solanki | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanne Kelly Rata | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dudley Cox | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Walsh | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Holyhead | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Davies | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Swarbrick | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anna-Louise Sarah Williams | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Ashton | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.78k | £10.08k | £14 | £125.86k | £92.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.60k | £19.73k | £28.02k | £110.46k | £110.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF ICE SKATING; (B) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR ICE SKATING IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR CHILDREN UNDER 18 YEARS OF AGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (C) TO RELIEVE, WITHIN THE FYDLE COAST AREA OF LANCASHIRE, POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS OF MONEY OR MONIES WORTH TO INDIVIDUALS UNDER 18 YEARS OF AGE IN ONCIDTIONS OF NEED ('THE BENEFICIARIES') OR ORGANISATIONS DEALING WITH SUCH BENEFICIARIES SO AS TO RELIEVE SUCH NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Whitefield Close
Rufford
Ormskirk
L40 1US
- Phone:
- 07779617150
- Email:
- info@bidca.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window