THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD, HYTHE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP OPEN TO ALL PROVISION OF SACRED SPACE FOR PERSONAL PRAYER & CONTEMPLATION PASTORAL WORK INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK & THE BEREAVED TAKING OF RELIGIOUS ASSEMBLIES IN SCHOOLS SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 16 November 2011: Previously excepted registration
- 14 April 2022: Funds received from 307749 LAWRENCE WELLAR
- ST LEONARDS PCC, HYTHE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael David William Darkins | Chair | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN EVE JONES | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CHAMBERS | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
GWYNETH BATCHELOR | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOHN BISHOP | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Lionel Godwin Owen | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||
HELEN FLORENCE WAYMOUTH | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH TYLER | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|||||
John Charles Wren | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN HAZEL ANNE JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.11k | £107.42k | £901.46k | £146.86k | £172.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.41k | £146.90k | £148.07k | £215.10k | £130.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £881.79k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £19.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £7 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £774.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £148.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £1.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Leonards Church
Oak Walk
Hythe
Kent
CT21 5DN
- Phone:
- 01303266217
- Email:
- slhythe@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window