THE MARY WOOD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mary Wood Trust strives to advance education and relieve poverty by providing sponsorship, training funds and items for disadvantaged children, young people (especially girls and young women), and those in need in S W Uganda. It also helps to develop facilities in Kanungu District, and in particular at Ruth Memorial Nursery School and Nyakabungo Girls' Secondary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Uganda
Governance
- 17 October 2011: Standard registration
- MWT (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLARE RAMSDEN | Chair | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL WOOD | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Hutchins | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER JOHN CALDWELL WOOD | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|||||
ANN JULIA GOVER | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN SMITH | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.93k | £43.47k | £38.35k | £40.24k | £82.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.52k | £32.15k | £25.14k | £38.27k | £76.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01/08/2010
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE SCHOLARSHIPS FOR EDUCATION AND TRAINING WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLES' LIFE SKILLS AND OPPORTUNITIES IN UGANDA.2.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING SPONSORSHIP, TRAINING, FUNDS OR ITEMS FOR DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THOSE IN NEED IN UGANDA.3.TO DEVELOP FACILITIES IN KINKIZI, KANUNGU DISTRICT, IN PARTICULAR NYAKABUNGO GIRLS SECONDARY SCHOOL AND RUTH MEMORIAL SCHOOL, IN ORDER TO ACHIEVE THE AIMS OUTLINED IN 1 AND 2 ABOVE.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Handforth Road
Wilmslow
SK9 2LX
- Phone:
- 01625531233
- Email:
- marywoodtrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window