THE WILLOW TREE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre provides a seven day a week free, confidential, impartial and factually correct support service for women and their partners facing unintended pregnancy, baby loss and post abortion; whatever their age, beliefs, background or circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Webb | Chair | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
HELEN HARRISON | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Reveley | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Pettipher | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.80k | £9.11k | £18.08k | £24.95k | £18.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.20k | £27.71k | £27.14k | £31.67k | £24.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.49k | £750 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/08/2011
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY AND INTO THE EFFECTS THEREOF UPON WOMEN WHETHER PHYSICAL, MEDICAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL. (B) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WOMEN'S HEALTH. (C) THE PROVISION0001 OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN AND THEIR PARTNERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, DISTRESS OF POVERTY DURING OR AS A RESULT OF PREGNANCY OR FOLLOWING AN ABORTION, MISCARRIAGE, COT DEATH, STILL BIRTH, LOSS OF A CHILD OR SEXUAL ABUSE. (D) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH MAY CONVENIENTLY BE CARRIED ON IN CONNECTION WITH THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willow Tree Centre
St. Nicholas Family Centre
Chargrove
Yate
BRISTOL
BS37 4LG
- Phone:
- 07760 830525
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window