Financial history TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH CHELMSFORD

Charity Number: 1144617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £85.10k £77.53k £87.03k £97.46k £121.60k
Total expenditure £126.38k £93.96k £97.99k £112.25k £97.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A