Trustees TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH CHELMSFORD

Charity Number: 1144617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Cassels Trustee 01 March 2025
THE METHODIST CHURCH CHELMSFORD CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Christine Elles Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Russell Burton Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
John Cullum Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Judith Molyneux Trustee 01 March 2024
None on record
Janet Lesley Wintle Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Karen Elizabeth Murrell Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
ERIC JOHN SMART Trustee 01 June 2018
BEDFORDSHIRE ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Nigel Charles Murrell Trustee 01 June 2018
CHARITY OF HARRIET WALKER
Received: On time
Anthony Bender Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Kay Burton Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Hilary Georgina Walden Trustee 25 February 2018
None on record
MRS VAL SCOTT Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
DIANE MARY POTTER Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
MR JEFF GREEN Trustee 27 September 2011
THE METHODIST CHURCH CHELMSFORD CIRCUIT
Received: On time