Financial history CRE8 MACCLESFIELD LIMITED

Charity Number: 1147150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £299.17k £365.01k £279.86k £309.07k £286.90k
Total expenditure £296.71k £334.68k £328.34k £318.28k £326.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.80k £23.50k N/A £1.55k £10.50k