Financial history AGE UK EAST LONDON

Charity number: 1144535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.95m £2.57m £3.03m £3.33m £3.47m
Total expenditure £1.86m £2.23m £2.89m £3.21m £3.30m
Income from government contracts £735.12k £884.07k £2.24m £2.48m £1.93m
Income from government grants £292.14k N/A £447.16k £777.13k £257.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £20.01k £38.07k £43.44k £2.92k £79.67k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.84m £2.46m £2.95m £3.32m £3.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £135 £37 £24 £409 £1.44k
Income - Other £92.02k £67.62k £30.82k £10.00k £54.05k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £27.06k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.86m £2.23m £2.89m £3.21m £3.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £16.85k £15.49k £24.73k £16.25k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0