Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST. DUNSTAN'S, CRANBROOK
Charity number: 1144409
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeniffer Ann Wigram | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Janette Isobel Lloyd | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Mary Hooper | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Celia Quarringtom | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Piper | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hancock | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Gwendy Bird | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Hough | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Isabel Upton | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tyniza Barbara-Ann Campbell | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Gasson | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Gwenneth Catherine Heyking | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Robin Stead | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Swann | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alun Aneuryn Jones | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.