Financial history FAITH REVIVAL ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1146868
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £91.90k £93.80k £106.97k £105.77k £104.41k
Total expenditure £93.07k £89.25k £87.39k £119.85k £103.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A