ENGINEERS FOR OVERSEAS DEVELOPMENT LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Engineers for Overseas Development exists to enhance the experience of young construction professionals, challenging members to undertake development projects which improve the health, hygiene, education and self-sufficiency for those from some of the poorest communities in rural Africa, and provides those participating with an opportunity to broaden their skills and experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
105 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ghana
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 05 October 2011: Standard registration
- EFOD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian William Flower OBE FICE | Chair | 05 October 2011 |
|
|||||
Julian Bryse Howe | Trustee | 29 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Petra Hodgson | Trustee | 29 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.33k | £54.36k | £9.28k | £37.64k | £17.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.63k | £71.13k | £32.14k | £87.79k | £31.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | £19.76k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING GRANTS, GOODS AND SERVICES TO COMMUNITIES OR INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE DESIGNING AND/OR BUILDING OF INFRASTRUCTURE; AND BY SETTING UP AND/OR SUPPORTING INCOME GENERATING PROJECTS AND BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FACILITIES EITHER GENERALLY OR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS, OR SERVICES; TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, TRAINING AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE AUTHORITIES; AND THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP B) RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 DAN-Y-BRYN AVENUE
RADYR
CARDIFF
CF15 8DD
- Phone:
- 02920842300
- Email:
- ian.flower@efod.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window