WIRRAL FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We collect food from the public via Churches, schools and supermarkets and through a voucher scheme held by frontline agencies registered with Wirral Foodbank who signpoint clients to us, we provide free three days worth of food for individuals and families in Crisis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wirral
Governance
- 19 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sue Chadwick | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
Michael Donnan | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
CLLR PHIL DAVIES | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.08k | £2.84k | £2.57k | £2.34k | £2.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23 | £23 | £0 | £45 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/12/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND SPECIFICALLY THE WIRRAL AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR DISTRESS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 14 Wirral Business Centre
Dock Road
Birkenhead
Wirral
CH41 1JW
- Phone:
- 01516387090
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window