MIKE CAMPBELL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation has been undertaking activities to contribute to the sound administration of human rights law, monitoring human rights abuses and relieving need among the victims of human rights abuses in Zimbabwe and with reference to the SADC Region
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- South Africa
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 06 December 2011: Standard registration
- MCF (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PENELOPE CLAIRE FREETH | Chair | 06 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Julia Ruston Hames | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Broughton Ridgway | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Luke Charles Hardingham | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan William Webb-Peploe | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ANNE SUMMERFIELD | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAXWELL PERKIN | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELISE MUTALENI ANGULA | Trustee | 03 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £241.06k | £159.61k | £143.63k | £169.19k | £143.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.59k | £164.24k | £146.87k | £168.99k | £175.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 September 2023 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 September 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS AND INCORPORATED INTO THE TREATY ESTABLISHING THE SOUTH AFRICAN DEVELOPMENT COMMUNITY (HEREINAFTER SADC), IN ZIMBABWE AND OTHER MEMBER COUNTIES OF SADC WHERE RELEVANT, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: • MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; • OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; • RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; • RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; • PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; • CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; • COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; • RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; • PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; • PROMOTING SYSTEMS OF REDRESS FOR VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES; • PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; • INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; • ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF HUMAN RIGHTS INSTITUTIONS SUCH AS THE SADC TRIBUNAL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodgate Farm
Oad Street
Borden
SITTINGBOURNE
ME9 8JX
- Phone:
- 01795842341
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window