THE V&A FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Foundation, as set out in its Memorandum and Articles are for the benefit of the public, to further, in so manner as the Trustees see fit, all or any of the objects from time to time of the Victoria and Albert Museum (V&A).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 November 2011: Standard registration
- 14 February 2025: Funds received from 1009198 THE TYPE MUSEUM TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baroness Nemat Shafik | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Lady Deborah Si Yin Buffini | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Catherine Colburn Hogel | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Caroline Louise Silver | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Peter John Marsden Williams | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Heather Jane Acton | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Hochhauser KC | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.41k | £136.73k | £1.13m | £20.20m | £92.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £869.13k | £458.96k | £902.55k | £1.01m | £826.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.13m | £20.01m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £1.00m | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £1.73k | £193.27k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £4.47k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £667.63k | £836.24k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £234.92k | £175.57k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £19.67k | £17.16k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £647.97k | £819.08k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £234.92k | £175.57k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 SEP 2011 as amended on 03 Nov 2016 as amended on 24 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the Foundation are for the benefit of the public, to further, in such manner as the Trustees of the Foundation see fit, all or any of the objects from time to time of the V&A and art, design and performance throughout the world in any manner incidental, conducive to or compatible with the charitable objects of the V&A. The Foundation achieves these objects through the award of grants.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICTORIA & ALBERT MUSEUM
CROMWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW7 2RL
- Phone:
- 02079422771
- Email:
- a.misquitta@vam.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window