SNAPE INSTITUTE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining and improving the village hall as a first class venue for village activities and providing a range of events to include the whole village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,341 from 4 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 01 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH LOWE | Chair | 10 October 2011 |
|
|||||
John Robert White | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Fiddler | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
David Charles Smith | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Old | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Blanchard | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|||||
David Milner | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|||||
ANN DONALDSON | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|||||
JOHN KNOPP | Trustee | 01 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ABEL | Trustee | 01 December 2011 |
|
|||||
RACHEL DUCK | Trustee | 01 December 2011 |
|
|||||
DIANE HAMILTON HOSKING | Trustee | 10 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.54k | £18.54k | £24.71k | £26.23k | £26.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.44k | £8.07k | £10.98k | £15.59k | £15.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.83k | £16.10k | £1.13k | £3.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 February 2024 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 February 2024 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/03/1975
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SNAPE IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Snape Institute
Meadow Lane
Snape
Bedale
North Yorkshire
DL8 2TR
- Phone:
- 01677470232
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window