MANCHESTER ALLIANCE FOR COMMUNITY CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the third sector by building the capacity of third sector organisations and provide them the necessary support, information and services to enable them to pursue or contribute to any charitable service; promoting volunteering within the sector; organising and facilitating co operation and partnership working between third sector, statutory and other relevant bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,146,164
Donations and legacies | £150.02k | |
Charitable activities | £1.89m | |
Other trading activities | £106.08k | |
Investments | £4.94k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,374,040
Raising funds | £35.90k | |
Charitable activities | £2.32m | |
Other | £21.04k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,123,372 from 5 government contract(s) and £564,717 from 8 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £56.94k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.32m |
People

33 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Manchester City
Governance
- 15 February 2012: Standard registration
- MACC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mona Moussa | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Bethany Leslie | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Nicola Claire Shellens | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Daniel Taylor | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rodger Cairns | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Janet Elizabeth Finucane | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Charles Kwaku-Odoi | Trustee | 10 December 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr Julian Skyrme | Trustee | 14 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08m | £1.03m | £1.64m | £1.77m | £2.15m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02m | £1.11m | £1.58m | £1.60m | £2.37m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £534.50k | £579.00k | £579.00k | £899.00k | £1.12m | |
|
Income from government grants | £111.30k | £20.00k | £70.00k | £335.80k | £564.72k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.59k | £58.34k | £52.90k | £89.63k | £150.02k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £73.61k | £47.64k | £79.60k | £141.55k | £106.08k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.00m | £920.21k | £1.51m | £1.54m | £1.89m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £279 | £810 | £346 | £1.81k | £4.94k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £336 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £992.25k | £1.09m | £1.56m | £1.56m | £2.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £22.83k | £5.68k | £7.78k | £18.58k | £35.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.65k | £10.62k | £6.45k | £13.53k | £9.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £145.27k | £625.79k | £601.22k | £1.10m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £8.42k | £12.55k | £16.15k | £19.23k | £21.04k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.61k | £4.11k | £1.95k | £3.37k | £2.95k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.30m | £1.23m | £846.70k | £1.05m | £862.94k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £517.84k | £530.16k | £76.40k | £111.34k | £147.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF MANCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY 1. PROMOTING THE THIRD SECTOR BY: (A) BUILDING THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE; (B) PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING WITHIN THE SECTOR; (C), ORGANISING AND FACILITATING CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES. 2. THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 3. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (B) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (C) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE OBJECTS: 'THIRD SECTOR' MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. THEY DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MACC
ST THOMAS CENTRE
ARDWICK GREEN NORTH
MANCHESTER
M12 6FZ
- Phone:
- 01612771010
- Email:
- mike@macc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window