NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF AGRICULTURAL BOTANY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to provide independent science-based research & information. We support NIAB (Charity No:1064230) through the provision of facilities & funding to support the provision of information & advice to farmers, growers & educators; A programme of public good plant breeding; crop variety performance trials & laboratory testing; education & training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 March 2024
Total income:
£1,534,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £828.00k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £706.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,983,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.98m | |
Other | £0 |
£97,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.98m |
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP GRAHAM WYNN | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||
John Robert Latham | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Eric Godfrey OBE | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Auld MacDonald | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|||||
John Andrew Elliot | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHARLES WILLIAM LOOKER | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/03/2020 | 29/03/2021 | 29/03/2022 | 29/03/2023 | 29/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.88m | £4.11m | £1.83m | £1.17m | £1.53m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50m | £3.03m | £5.28m | £2.74m | £2.98m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.00m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £518.00k | £3.84m | £1.50m | £742.00k | £828.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £291.00k | £265.00k | £291.38k | £427.00k | £706.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £67.00k | £6.00k | £43.41k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.50m | £3.03m | £5.28m | £2.74m | £2.98m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £122.00k | £62.00k | £85.00k | £19.20k | £25.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.00m | £1.00m | £3.10m | £1.05m | £1.34m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 29/03/2020 | 29/03/2021 | 29/03/2022 | 29/03/2023 | 29/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £52.15m | £54.71m | £54.35m | £68.71m | £39.39m | |
|
Long-term investments | £24.75m | £25.42m | £23.25m | £0 | £25.87m | |
|
Other assets | £4.00m | £5.90m | £3.92m | £12.95m | £9.69m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £26.64m | £28.40m | £25.82m | £27.69m | £26.85m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO: 4.1 PROMOTE AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE AND ARBORICULTURE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): 4.1.1 THE IMPROVEMENT OF CROPS BY MEANS OF THE TESTING OF VARIETIES, PLANTS AND SEEDS THROUGH RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH; 4.1.2 THE CARRYING OUT OF TRIALS FOR THE IDENTIFICATION AND CLASSIFICATION OF PLANT VARIETIES AND ASSESSMENT OF THEIR PERFORMANCE, THE MULTIPLICATION OF STOCKS OF SEED AND THE MAINTENANCE OF REFERENCE COLLECTIONS; 4.1.3 THE TESTING OF SEEDS, PLANTS AND PLANT DERIVED OR RELATED MATERIALS; 4.1.4 RESEARCH INTO AND TESTING OF SEEDS AND THE AUTHENTICATION AND CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCTIVE MATERIAL AND PLANT VARIETIES; 4.1.5 THE DISCOVERY AND ASSESSMENT OF THE VALUE OF METHODS OF TREATMENT, PROCESSES AND DESIGNS RELATING TO SEEDS, PLANTS AND CROPS AND OF BENEFIT TO AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, ARBORICULTURE THE SEED INDUSTRY OR ANY RELATED TRADE OR INDUSTRY; 4.2 SUPPORT THE NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF AGRICULTURAL BOTANY (THE INSTITUTE: REGISTERED CHARITY NO 1064230) IN THE PURSUIT OF ITS OBJECTS INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE PROVISION OF LAND, FACILITIES AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THE INSTITUTE UPON SUCH TERMS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE TO ENABLE IT TO PURSUE ITS OBJECTS; AND 4.3 PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 Lawrence Weaver Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0LE
- Phone:
- 01223342304
- Email:
- trust@niab.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window