Trustees WALES FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Charity number: 1145230

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Jones | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALUN JONES | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Huw Rowlands | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hughson | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Hampson-Smith | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Thomas | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Niall Evans | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dewi Davies | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jones | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Richards | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALED THOMAS | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.