Accounts and annual returns HARUNANI & CO CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145159
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 March 2025 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 March 2025 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 March 2025 417 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 March 2025 417 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 March 2025 782 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 March 2025 782 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2025 1147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 March 2025 1147 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days