Financial history THE SOCIETY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHILOSOPHICAL ENQUIRY AND REFLECTION IN EDUCATION

Charity number: 1144595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £435.80k £415.38k £417.07k £416.20k £430.53k
Total expenditure £699.07k £463.34k £360.13k £413.23k £443.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A