PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An independent charity based at the Diocese of Portsmouth that seeks to facilitate sustainable and innovative approaches to locally based social action, especially, though not exclusively, at the parish level in SE Hampshire, Portsmouth, the Isle of Wight, and beyond. It works with people of all faiths and none without preference or prejudice, and is committed to working in a fully inclusive way.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £114,876 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
3800 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 December 2011: Standard registration
- PDCSR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Jonathan Robert Montgomery | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Elaine Mary Coe | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hassan | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Bradstock | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Poulter | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Youern | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Robert Graham Brooke Solomon | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward Timothy Phillips | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.71k | £241.68k | £214.45k | £308.13k | £184.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £283.05k | £240.70k | £192.31k | £269.58k | £235.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £147.02k | £113.43k | £107.18k | £114.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/12/2011 as amended on 11 Sep 2019 as amended on 20 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
4.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES CARRIED OUT IN CONNECTION WITH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF PORTSMOUTH. 4.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR MEN AND WOMEN SO AS TO ENCOURAGE THEM TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK, SOCIAL SERVICE AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY: THE EXPRESSION "SOCIAL SERVICE" BEING DEFINED AS MEANING ANY AND ALL ORGANISATIONS OR PERSONS PROVIDING (WHETHER UNDER STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS TO DO SO OR VOLUNTARY) SERVICES TO THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE FOR THE ASSISTANCE AND ADVICE OF PERSONS SUFFERING ILL HEALTH, POVERTY, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS OR GENERALLY BEING HANDICAPPED OR SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED; OR TO PREVENT OR ALLEVIATE ILL HEALTH, POVERTY, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISTRESS OR ANY HANDICAPPED OR SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED CONDITION. 4.3 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE MORAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE SAID AREA AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ALL SUCH RESEARCH. 4.4 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY OF THE CHURCH AT PARISH, DEANERY AND DIOCESAN LEVELS TO ADDRESS, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHERS, ISSUES OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN COMMUNITIES IN PORTSMOUTH, HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLE OF WIGHT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF CONFIDENTIAL COUNSELLING SERVICES AT SUITABLE PREMISES. 4.5 THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, INSTRUCTION AND OTHER SERVICES IN ANY DIOCESE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND INCLUDING THE PUBLICATION OF MATERIAL IN WRITTEN OR ELECTRONIC FORMS AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, CONFERENCES, COURSES AND LECTURES. "THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR' MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING SOCIAL SERVICE. "CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES." "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES."
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR
PENINSULAR HOUSE
WHARF ROAD
PORTSMOUTH
PO2 8HB
- Phone:
- 02392899674
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window