Trustees WARRINGTON DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity number: 1145798

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kath Buckley | Chair | 01 June 2014 |
|
|||||
STEVEN PAUL CULLEN | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Susan Emery | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Roberts | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Timmis | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Marks | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN SIDEBOTTOM | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.