Financial history ROSSETT & BURTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1145638
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £20.90k £19.19k £24.81k £28.80k £25.74k
Total expenditure £19.40k £26.58k £22.29k £24.66k £17.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.00k £500