Financial history MAYBURY AND SHEERWATER COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1145217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £30.16k £33.07k £32.60k £43.76k £27.03k
Total expenditure £44.30k £31.15k £30.07k £27.92k £34.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.70k £28.70k £28.70k £32.20k £1.20k